RI S2547 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the terms "approach" and "approach zones" to mean airport land and airspace as defined by the FAA.
Title
Airports And Landing Fields -- Airport Zoning
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - Senate - Fields - airport zoning approval of amendment lc 004935/2 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/13/2020) |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-07-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (07/09/2020) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2020) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |