RI S2546 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the directors of BHDDH to develop and implement a program to offer financial incentives to hospitals and emergency facilities that achieve Level 1 certification in level of care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Discharge Planning

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-01SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/01/2018)
2018-04-24SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-04-19SenateScheduled for consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-04-12SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback