RI S2545 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires insurance coverage for the treatment of mental health and substance use disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Coverage For Mental Illness And Substance Abuse

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-14SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-05-31SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-29SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2018)
2018-05-29SenateSenate voted to recommit to Senate Health and Human Services
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar
2018-05-17SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-11SenateScheduled for consideration (05/17/2018)
2018-04-10SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback