RI S2543 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for authorizations for services to developmentally disabled adults issued on or after October 1, 2018, be developed on an annual basis with funding for these services to be issued on an annual basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division Of Developmental Disabilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-22SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/22/2018)
2018-05-15SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-11SenateScheduled for consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-03-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-12SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-03-12SenateMeeting postponed (03/13/2018)
2018-03-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback