RI S2543 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Mar 27 Senate Health and Human Services Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]


Provides for authorizations for services to developmentally disabled adults issued on or after July 1, 2018 be developed on an annual basis with funding for these services to be issued on an annual basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Division Of Developmental Disabilities



2018-03-12SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-03-12SenateMeeting postponed (03/13/2018)
2018-03-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services


Rhode Island State Sources

Bill Comments