RI S2538 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows for a nurse to delegate tasks to certified nursing assistants and authorizes the department of health to promulgate regulations that delineate delegable tasks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Nursing Assistants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-15SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/15/2018)
2018-05-08SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-04SenateScheduled for consideration (05/08/2018)
2018-05-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27SenateScheduled for consideration (05/01/2018)
2018-03-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-12SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-03-12SenateMeeting postponed (03/13/2018)
2018-03-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback