RI S2534 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts certain prepackaged manufacturer-supplied steroids and hormones from the pharmaceutical dosage limits contained in the uniform controlled substance act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Uniform Controlled Substances Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateSigned by Governor
2018-06-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-19HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-13HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/13/2018)
2018-05-02HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-01SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/01/2018)
2018-04-24SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-19SenateScheduled for consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-03-08SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback