RI S2531 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows feminine hygiene products to be donated by businesses to nonprofit charities.
Title
Feminine Hygiene Product Donation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |