RI S2530 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the current law so that RI adult residents would be included in the department of health immunization registry presently maintained for children. Also provides that any person may opt-out of the registry by contacting the department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department Of Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-31SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/31/2018)
2018-05-24SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-05-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback