RI S2526 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires drug manufactures to establish fund and manage state approved drug take back programs, free of charge to the consumer and pharmacy.
Title
Relating To Food And Drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2020) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2526.pdf |