RI S2521 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from sales and use taxes specialized packaging equipment such as kegs and barrel containers for alcoholic beverages.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes--liability And Computation
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/08/2018) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |