RI S2518 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that original equipment manufacturers of agricultural equipment would provide independent service providers repair information and tools to maintain and repair electronics of the agricultural equipment.
Title
Agricultural Equipment Right To Repair Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2022) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |