RI S2515 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits on-duty/off-duty law enforcement officer from utilizing any robot/police robot dog/UAV, whether armed/unarmed, within the scope of their employment as well as police departments from purchase/procurement of any robots/UVAs/police robot dogs.
Title
State Affairs And Government--prohibition On The Use Of Police Robot Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |