RI S2510 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the definition of a kennel to exclude a residence where for a fee, a person provides sheltering, feeding and watering, of not more than 4 animals, not owned by the person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence as amended (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2018-06-20SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-05-31HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-30SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-04SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2018-04-04SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2018-03-30SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback