RI S2508 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides only licensed attorney can be title insurance agents and determine insurability/marketability. Prohibits discounted insurance premiums and fee sharing with unlicensed agents and attorneys.
Title
Rhode Island Title Insurers Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/08/2022) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2508.pdf |