RI S2506 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes and requires funding for a world language and dual language immersion program.
Title
The World Language And Dual Language Immersion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |