RI S2503 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain health plans to annually submit their contracts with physicians and providers to the director of health and health insurance commissioner for approval.
Title
Health Care Accessibility And Quality Assurance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2503.pdf |