RI S2502 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the standardization of mobile food establishment registrations by the department of business regulation to streamline the registration process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hawkers And Peddlers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-26HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub B in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub B
2018-06-22HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseMeeting postponed (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration
2018-06-19HouseCommittee transferred to House Corporations
2018-06-13HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-06-12SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-06SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/12/2018)
2018-06-05SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-01SenateScheduled for consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-03-22SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-16SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback