RI S2497 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the "Insurance Data Security Act" which would adopt the National Association of Insurance Commissioners Model Act regarding data security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Data Security Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2018-06-05SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2018-06-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-03-06SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018)
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback