RI S2484 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the division of motor vehicles to issue a courtesy registration plate for a vehicle that is registered as street rod or custom vehicle pursuant to ยง 31-3-31.1
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Registration of vehicles approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2018) |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2018) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |