RI S2479 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance - Nonprofit Hospital Service Corporations
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance - Nonprofit Hospital Service Corporations
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Frank Devall [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Committee continued | |
2012-03-12 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2012) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2479.pdf |