RI S2468 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds certain due process provisions regarding issuance of subpoenas/inspection of licensee's office to discipline and oversight powers of board.
Title
Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-05-13 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/05/2016) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2016) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |