RI S2447 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines and provides that "per- and polyfluoroalkyl substances" (PFAS) be included within the definition of "hazardous substances" for purposes of industrial property remediation and reuse.
Title
Industrial Property Remediation And Reuse Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |