RI S2447 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Entitles person to have criminal conviction records expunged if the offense is decriminalized subsequent to the conviction.
Title
Expungement Of Criminal Records
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-01 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2018) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |