RI S2447 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Permit title insurance companies and their agents to issue closing funds protection insurance on residential property closings for property consisting of four (4) units or less.
Title
Title Insurers Issuing Closing Or Settlement Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Closing or settlement protection approval of amendment lc 004700/2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-05 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2014) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/25/2014) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |