RI S2443 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Owners of animals in RISPCA custody to pay for animal's care or animal may be forfeited.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2022-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-05-18 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/17/2022) |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2022) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |