RI S2435 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the usury rate to twelve percent (12%).
Title
Interest And Usury
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. John Burke [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Substitute A be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |