RI S2435 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows cities and towns to issue violations to vehicles which are used for illegal dumping of materials, pursuant to city and town ordinances.
Title
Ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |