RI S2435 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Meeting postponed (05/07/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Meeting postponed (05/07/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Add to the purpose of distributed generation standard contracts so that it would encourage the reuse and redevelopment of contaminated property as defined in this act.
Title
Distributed Generation Standard Contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/07/2014) |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2435.pdf |