RI S2433 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a person to make satisfactory arrangements for the payment of motor vehicle fines or costs, and would permit a person to request an ability to pay hearing before a license is suspended for failure to pay such fines or costs.
Title
Suspension Or Revocation Of Licenses - Violations
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2018) |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |