RI S2432 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends how credit bureaus doing business in Rhode Island may disclose to inquiring users of credit reports by requiring that in addition to the social security number, the name matches the identity of the person who is the subject of the inquiry.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions--deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-06-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2022) |
2022-05-26 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |