RI S2430 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits any questioning of a juvenile who is suspected of delinquent or criminal behavior, unless the parent of guardian of the juvenile is present, or unless an attorney is present or the juvenile and their parents have waived their presence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proceedings In Family Court

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-03-06SenateSenate read and passed
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/06/2018)
2018-02-27SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback