RI S2427 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - House passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires notice to the assessor of new subdivisions of land and provides for a proration of real estate taxes to be applied thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-05-31HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2018-05-29SenateSenate read and passed
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/29/2018)
2018-05-22SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for consideration (05/22/2018)
2018-03-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback