RI S2426 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires conservation and preservation restrictions to be liberally interpreted in favor of the grants awarded.
Title
Conservation And Preservation Restrictions On Real Property
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2020) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2426.pdf |