RI S2426 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates each motor vehicle policy insurer provide a weekly record of each policy to the department of motor vehicles. A vehicle owner not insured for four (4) reporting periods must be notified to meet certain requirements.
Title
Uninsured Motorist Identification Database Procedure
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2018) |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2018) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |