RI S2423 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Urging The Federal Government To Pursue A Broad Range Of Measures To Reduce The Danger Of Nuclear War, To Sign And Ratify The Treaty On The Prohibition Of Nuclear Weapons (tpnw), To Make Nuclear Disarmament The Centerpiece Of Our National Security Policy, And To Spearhead A Global Effort To Prevent Nuclear War
Title
Senate Resolution Urging The Federal Government To Pursue A Broad Range Of Measures To Reduce The Danger Of Nuclear War, To Sign And Ratify The Treaty On The Prohibition Of Nuclear Weapons (tpnw), To Make Nuclear Disarmament The Centerpiece Of Our National Security Policy, And To Spearhead A Global Effort To Prevent Nuclear War
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/03/2022) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2423.pdf |