RI S2410 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the penalties for a first violation from $500 to $1,500 and for a second violation from $950 to $2,000.
Title
Plumbers And Irrigators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2014) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |