RI S2409 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires prospective reimbursement for state-licensed facilities providing mental health, substance abuse treatment and/or prevention services with an annual reconciliation for any underpayment or overpayment.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2409.pdf |