RI S2408 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes hospital medical staff to elect whether or not to participate in a maintenance of certification program, to elect medical specialty board to implement the program and prohibits insurers from denying reimbursement based solely on this election

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-06-20SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-20SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-20SenateCommittee voted to reconsider
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-04-12SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback