RI S2407 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Barrington to have three alternate members on zoning board who may participate in hearings and shall vote in the absence of other members. Each member of the board may vote only if they attended all hearings relative to the matter before board.
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-27 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2020) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2020) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |