RI S2406 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the name of the title of chapter 5-90 to Ryan's Law.
Title
Authority To Fine Healthcare Professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-07 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |