RI S2405 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows parents or guardians of a child to opt out of vaccines for non-casual contact diseases transmitted by sexual contact.
Title
Department Of Health
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2405.pdf |