RI S2400 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows pregnant women with an annual family income above applicable Medicaid income limit to be eligible to purchase health insurance through one of the Medicaid managed care plans.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |