RI S2399 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits insurance companies from varying the premium rates charged for a health coverage plan based on the gender of the individual policy holder, enrollee, subscriber, or member.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-04-03SenateSenate read and passed
2018-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/03/2018)
2018-03-22SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-22SenateCommittee voted to reconsider
2018-03-22SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback