RI S2385 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages -- Retail Licenses (would Repeal The Section Whereby The Town Council Of The Town Of Smithfield, After Application, Is Authorized To Exempt From The Provisions Of This Section Any Class B, C Or I License Intended To Be Located On Plat 45, Lot 042)
Title
An Act Relating To Alcoholic Beverages -- Retail Licenses (would Repeal The Section Whereby The Town Council Of The Town Of Smithfield, After Application, Is Authorized To Exempt From The Provisions Of This Section Any Class B, C Or I License Intended To Be Located On Plat 45, Lot 042)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2012) | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2385.pdf |