RI S2381 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the compensation of direct-care staff of nursing facilities as a result of the application of the inflation index.
Title
Medical Assistance
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Committee heard |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2381.pdf |