RI S2363 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminates the requirement that a waiver for fuel content standards be obtained from both weights and measures (DLT) and the department of environmental management (DEM).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Sale Of Gasoline

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18SenateSigned by Governor
2018-06-13SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-13HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/13/2018)
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-05-03HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-05-02SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/02/2018)
2018-04-25SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-19SenateScheduled for consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-02-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback