RI S2358 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - House voted to recommit to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Adds a definition for "fuel oil terminal" for the purposes of the Biodiesel heating oil act of 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Biodiesel Heating Oil Act Of 2013

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseHouse voted to recommit to House H.E.W.
2018-06-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-19SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-03-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback