RI S2357 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the annual bidding and enrollment process pursuant to this chapter.
Title
Renewable Energy Growth Program
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |