RI S2356 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE RHODE ISLAND CLIMATE CHANGE AND OCEAN PROTECTION YOUTH EDUCATION AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT ACT - Establishes the Rhode Island Climate Change and Ocean Protection Youth Education and Workforce Development Act.
Title
Establishes the Rhode Island Climate Change and Ocean Protection Youth Education and Workforce Development Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE RHODE ISLAND CLIMATE CHANGE AND OCEAN PROTECTION YOUTH EDUCATION AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT ACT
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE RHODE ISLAND CLIMATE CHANGE AND OCEAN PROTECTION YOUTH EDUCATION AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2356.pdf |